NH HB1355 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate Sen. Bragdon Moved Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate Sen. Bragdon Moved Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295
Summary
Relative to certain Medicaid appropriations.
Title
Relative to certain Medicaid appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Senate Sen. Bragdon Moved Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Sen. Sgambati Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13, Pg.282 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Refer to Interim Study Not Voted On | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of Finance; Senate Journal 13, Pg.279 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of the Calendar; Senate Journal 13, Pg.275 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study 4/7/10; Senate Calendar 14A | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Hearing: April 1, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance, Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2010-03-11 | House Reconsideration (Rep Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.1327 | |
2010-03-11 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 270-35; House Journal 24, PG.1327 | |
2010-03-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place on Mar 11 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 23, PG.1294 | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 10 (vote 13-11; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1029 | |
2010-01-14 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Full Committee Work Session: 1/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 6, PG.237 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2355&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |