NH HB1665 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1809s, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1809s, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to student eligibility for the education freedom accounts program.
Title
Relative to student eligibility for the education freedom accounts program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 186 N: 192 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2024-02-08 - House - OTP (Y: 190 N: 189 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - OTP (Y: 190 N: 189 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1809s, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 33 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 186-192 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 33 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 31 |
2024-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-189 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 29 |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 01/30/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |