NH HB640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a public boat access donation program for operators of non-motorized boats and requiring the fish and game department to prepare a report relating to such program.
Title
Establishing a public boat access donation program for operators of non-motorized boats and requiring the fish and game department to prepare a report relating to such program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2839h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 47 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2839h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 47 |
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (NT) (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 |
2019-10-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)