NH SB418 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0183; Effective 08/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0183; Effective 08/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adding National Guard members to the absentee voting laws and relative to enrollment of laws.
Title
Adding National Guard members to the absentee voting laws and relative to enrollment of laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0183; Effective 08/02/2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with House Amendments # 1284h, New Title, #1479h, New Title, and #1669h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1669h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 28 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1669h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 28 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1669h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 6-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 13 |
2016-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-04-21 | House | Public Hearing: 04/26/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Legislative Administration 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 45 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1284h and 1479h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 45 |
2016-04-20 | House | FLAM #2016-1479h (NT) (Rep. Hoelzel): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 45 |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment #2016-1284h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 44 |
2016-04-20 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoelzel) 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 2 |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1284h (NT) for 04/20/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 8 |
2016-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-04-06 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-1284h: 04/12/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |