NY S01239 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Title
Provides for the transfer of a portion of fines issued for illegally passing a school bus to the comprehensive school bus driver safety training program for the study and promotion of issues involving school bus safety; establishes a school bus motorist education fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00458 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION