VA SB188 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
Summary
Virginia Military Parents Equal Protection Act; creation. Allows a court to enter a temporary order modifying custody or visitation based on a parent's deployment. Upon the motion of the deploying parent returning from deployment, the court shall hold an expedited hearing within 30 days. At the hearing, the nondeploying parent bears the burden of showing that reentry of the custody or visitation order in effect before the deployment is no longer in the child's best interests. The bill also requires that any temporary custody or visitation order entered pursuant to this Act shall provide that (i) the nondeploying parent shall reasonably accommodate the leave schedule of the deploying parent, (ii) the nondeploying parent shall facilitate telephonic and electronic mail contact between the child and the deploying parent, and (iii) the deploying parent shall provide timely information regarding his leave schedule to the nondeploying parent. This bill incorporates
Title
Military Parents Equal Protection Act; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 750 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB188ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB188H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 089595240-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 089595240-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB188S2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Stolle agreed to 080290328-S2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 080290328-S2 (Stolle) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Cuccinelli withdrawn | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 080289240-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080289240-S1 | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084692240 |
Same As/Similar To
SB170 (Similar To) 2008-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB188-Herring) (11-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB188 |