WA HB2095 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the sustainable farms and fields grant program.
Title
Establishing the sustainable farms and fields grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5947 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2095&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2095.pdf |