WA HB2629 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating provisions related to adoption petitions.
Title
Updating provisions related to adoption petitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | ELCS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2629&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2629.pdf |