WA SB5820 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
Pending: House Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
Pending: House Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing eligibility for child care and early learning programs for homeless and other vulnerable children.
Title
Increasing eligibility for child care and early learning programs for homeless and other vulnerable children.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.