WA SB6063 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of persistent offender to exclude convictions for offenses committed by someone under the age of 18 and providing for resentencing.
Title
Modifying the definition of persistent offender to exclude convictions for offenses committed by someone under the age of 18 and providing for resentencing.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | HS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2154 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 94a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 94a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |