FL H0559 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurers & pharmacy benefit managers to offer online prior authorization process; prohibits health insurers & health maintenance organizations from requiring insureds & subscribers to repeat step therapy protocols; provides that new health insurers & health maintenance organizations may impose prior authorization requirement for continued coverage.
Title
Prescription Drug Utilization Management
Sponsors
House Health Market Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Jackie Toledo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H271 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S906 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
S906 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 42393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |