US SB3509 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Congressional Award Act to reauthorize through FY2023 the Congressional Award Board.
Title
Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-10-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-10-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9359) |
2018-09-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9359) |
2018-09-28 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-09-27 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-09-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6348; text: CR S6348; text of measure as introduced: CR S6346) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB6862 (Same As) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1082 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3278 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB6862 (Same As) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1082 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3278 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.