FL S1334 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the arrest, charge, prosecution, or penalization under specified provisions of a person acting in good faith who seeks medical assistance for an individual experiencing, or believed to be experiencing, an alcohol-related overdose; authorizing each county to establish a supervised bond program with the concurrence of the chief judge of the judicial circuit, the county's chief correctional officer, the state attorney, and the public defender; authorizing the Department of Corrections to extend the limits of the place of confinement to allow an inmate to participate in supervised community release, subject to certain requirements, as prescribed by the department by rule, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-21SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H589 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H595 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Ordered enrolled
H607 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S338 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S346 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S400 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S406 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S408 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S530 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 595
S534 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H705 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3736055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
562112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627743Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
636238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
642038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7940115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9070421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
946503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback